No. 21-1271
Title:Timothy K. Moore, in His Official Capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rebecca Harper, et al.
Docketed:March 21, 2022
Linked with 21A455
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(413PA21)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2022Application (21A455) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Response to application (21A455) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 5 p.m. on Wednesday, March 2, 2022.
Feb 25 2022Letter dated February 25, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed.
Main Document
Mar 02 2022Response to application from State Respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondents Rebecca Harper, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondent Common Cause filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondents North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Republican National Committee, NRCC, North Carolina Republican Party.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Reply of applicants Timothy Moore, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Application (21A455) referred to the Court.
Mar 07 2022Application (21A455) denied by the Court. Justice Kavanaugh concurring in the denial of the application for stay. (Detached opinion). Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from the denial of the application for stay. (Detached opinion).
Mar 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2022 to June 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2022.
Apr 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Redistricting Trust filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of Common Cause in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of State Respondents in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of Rebecca Harper, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Timothy Moore, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sarah Gardner Boyce
    Counsel of Record
NC Department of Justice
Post Office Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

sboyce@ncdoj.gov
7046747708
Party name: State Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Common Cause
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Rebecca Harper, et al.
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc.
Other
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jtorchinsky@holtzmanvogel.com
540 341 8808
Party name: National Republican Redistricting Trust