No. 21-1270
Title:MOAC Mall Holdings LLC, Petitioner
v.
Transform Holdco LLC, et al.
Docketed:March 21, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20- 1846(L))
   Decision Date:December 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2022 to May 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2022.
May 20 2022Brief of respondents Transform Holdco LLC and Sears Holdings Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
May 31 2022Reply of petitioner MOAC Mall Holdings LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2022. The time to file respondents' on the merits is extended to and including October 19, 2022.
Aug 23 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, MOAC Mall Holdings LLC
Blanket Consent
Aug 29 2022Brief of petitioner MOAC Mall Holdings LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 30 2022Brief amici curiae of The Hon. Judith Fitzgerald (Bankruptcy Judge, Ret.), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Transform Holdco LLC and Sears Holdings Corporation
Blanket ConsentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: MOAC Mall Holdings LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
George Eric Brunstad Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
199 Lawrence Street
New Haven, CT 06511

Eric.Brunstad@dechert.com
860 524 3960
Party name: Transform Holdco LLC
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20854

davidkuney@dkuney.com
301-299-4336
Party name: The Hon. Judith Fitzgerald (Bankruptcy Judge, Ret.), and Law Professors Pamela Foohey, George Kuney, Robert Lawless, Jonathan Lipson, Bruce A. Markell, Nancy Rapoport, Richard Squire, Ray Warner and Jack Williams