No. 21-1264 | |
Title: | Larry Klayman, Petitioner v. Judicial Watch, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | March 18, 2022 |
Linked with 21A225 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-7105) |
Decision Date: | July 30, 2021 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 15, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 10 2021 | Application (21A225) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 14, 2021 to February 12, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Dec 15 2021 | Application (21A225) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 7, 2022. No further extensions of time shall be granted. See this Court's Rule 30. |
Jan 07 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2022) |
PetitionProof of ServiceAppendix | |
Apr 13 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Judicail Watch, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 20 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022. |
May 16 2022 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
Jun 09 2022 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 07 2022 | DISTRIBUTED. |
Aug 01 2022 | Rehearing DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh and Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Larry Klayman | 7050 W. Palmetto Park Rd. Boca Raton, FL 33433 | (561) 558-5336 |
Party name: Larry Klayman | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Richard W. Driscoll | Driscoll & Seltzer, PC 2000 Duke Street, Suite 300 Alexandria, VA 22314 rdriscoll@driscollseltzer.com | 703-879-2601 |
Party name: Judicail Watch, Inc., et al. |