No. 21-1262
Title:TitleMax of Delaware, Inc., dba TitleMax, et al., Petitioners
v.
Richard Vague, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Banking and Securities
Docketed:March 17, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1020)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Online Lenders Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2022Letter of counsel for the petitioners received.
Main Document
Apr 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Financial Services Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 18 2022Waiver of right of respondent Richard Vague, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Banking and Securities to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
Apr 21 2022Response Requested. (Due May 23, 2022)
May 23 2022Brief of Richard Vague, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Banking and Securities in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eugene Scalia
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

escalia@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: TitleMax of Delaware, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sean Andrew Kirkpatrick
    Counsel of Record
Pennsylvania Office of the Attorney General
Strawberry Square
15th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17120

skirkpatrick@attorneygeneral.gov
717-705-2331
Party name: Richard Vague, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Banking and Securities
Other
Jan T. Chilton
    Counsel of Record
Severson & Werson
One Embarcadero Center
Suite 2600
San Francisco, CA 94111

jtc@severson.com
4153983344
Party name: American Financial Services Association
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Online Lenders Alliance