No. 21-1258
Title:Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, in His Official Capacity, Petitioner
v.
Texas Entertainment Association, Inc.
Docketed:March 16, 2022
Linked with 21A242
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50262)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 12, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2021Application (21A242) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 10, 2022 to March 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 17 2021Application (21A242) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 14, 2022.
Mar 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2022 to May 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2022.
Apr 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Texas Association Against Sexual Assault.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2022Motion of Multistate Tax Commission and Federation of Tax Administrators for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (April 19, 2022)
Apr 15 2022Amicus brief of Multistate Tax Commission and Federation of Tax Administrators not accepted for filing. (April 19, 2022)
Apr 15 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Multistate Tax Commission and Federation of Tax Administrators.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2022Brief of respondent Texas Entertainment Association, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022Rule 29.6 Statement filed with respect to brief in opposition of respondent Texas Entertainment Association. filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin W. Allen
    Counsel of Record
Wallace & Allen
440 Louisana, Suite 1500
Houston, TX 77002

ballen@wallaceallen.com
713-227-1744
Party name: Texas Entertainment Association, Inc.
Other
Lila DeViveiros Disque
    Counsel of Record
Multistate Tax Commission
444 N. Capitol St. NW, Ste. 425
Washington, DC 20001

ldisque@mtc.gov
2026601906
Party name: Multistate Tax Commission and Federation of Tax Administrators
Susannah P. Torpey
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

storpey@winston.com
212.294.4690
Party name: Texas Association Against Sexual Assault