No. 21-1246
Title:Postmates, LLC, fka Postmates, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Melanie Winns, et al.
Docketed:March 15, 2022
Linked with 21A294
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A155717)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 13, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2021Application (21A294) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 11, 2022 to March 12, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 05 2022Application (21A294) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 12, 2022.
Mar 11 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
Apr 27 2022Response Requested. (Due May 27, 2022)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Postmates, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Amir MostafaviMostafavi Law Group, APC
528 Palisades Drive, Suite 220
Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

amir@mostafavilaw.com
310-473-1111
Party name: Melanie Winns, et al.