No. 21-1245
Title:O'Donnell & Sons, Inc., Petitioner
v.
New York State Department of Tax and Finance, et al.
Docketed:March 15, 2022
Linked with 21A274
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Second Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(2019-00150)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 12, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2021Application (21A274) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2022 to February 9, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 23 2021Application (21A274) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 9, 2022.
Jan 27 2022Application (21A274) to extend further the time from February 9, 2022 to March 11, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Application (21A274) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 11, 2022.
Mar 11 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2022 to May 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2022.
May 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2022 to May 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Sparacino PLLC
1920 L Street, NW
Suite 835
Washington, DC 20036

tejinder@sparacinopllc.com
2026293530
Party name: O’Donnell & Sons, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York State Dept. of Taxation & Finance, et al.