No. 21-1243
Title:City of Oakland, California, Petitioner
v.
Oakland Raiders, et al.
Docketed:March 14, 2022
Linked with 21A438
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-16075)
   Decision Date:December 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2022Application (21A438) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 2, 2022 to April 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Application (21A438) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 1, 2022.
Mar 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Open Markets Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Ruth Henricks filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022Waiver of right of respondent Oakland Raiders, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 13 2022Brief amici curiae of Sports Economists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
Apr 26 2022Response Requested. (Due May 26, 2022)
May 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 26, 2022 to June 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 27, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: City of Oakland
Attorneys for Respondents
Gregg H. Levy
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

glevy@cov.com
2026625292
Party name: Oakland Raiders, et al.
Other
Michael J. Aguirre
    Counsel of Record
Aguirre & Severson, LLP
501 W. Broadway
Suite 1050
San Diego, CA 92101

maguirre@amslawyers.com
(619) 876-5364
Party name: Ruth Henricks
Robert E. Litan
    Counsel of Record
Berger Montague PC
1818 Market Street
Suite 3600
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rlitan@bm.net
7858136357
Party name: Sports Economists
Andrew Arthur Schmidt
    Counsel of Record
Towards Justice
2840 Fairfax Street
Suite 220
Denver, CO 80207

andy@towardsjustice.org
207-619-0884
Party name: Open Markets Institute
Daniel John WalkerBerger Montague PC
2001 Pennsylvania Ave., Suite 300
Washington, DC 20912

dwalker@bm.net
202-559-9745
Party name: Sports Economists