No. 21-1239
Title:Securities and Exchange Commission, et al., Petitioners
v.
Michelle Cochran
Docketed:March 11, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10396)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 11 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2022)
Proof of ServicePetition
Mar 29 2022Brief of respondent Michelle Cochran filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 08 2022Letter of April 8, 2022, from the Solicitor General filed.
Main Document
Apr 11 2022Brief amici curiae of Raymond J. Lucia, Sr., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2022Letter of April 12, 2022 from counsel for respondent filed.
Main Document
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 19 2022Letter of the Solicitor General on behalf of the parties in No. 21-86, Axon Enterprise, Inc. v. FTC, and No. 21-1239, SEC v. Cochran, regarding alignment of parties and briefing filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2022Upon consideration of the letter of May 19, 2022, from the Solicitor General on behalf of the parties in No. 21-86 and No. 21-1239, respondent in No. 21-1239 has to and including June 30, 2022, within which to file the joint appendix and the opening brief on the merits in No. 21-1239. The Solicitor General has to and including August 8, 2022, within which to file a consolidated response brief on the merits on behalf of the federal parties in No. 21-86 and No. 21-1239, limited to 20,000 words.
Jun 10 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Michelle Cochran
Blanket Consent
Jun 16 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Securities and Exchange Commission, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 30 2022Brief of respondent Michelle Cochran filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 05 2022Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jul 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Raymond J. Lucia, Sr., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Phillip Goldstein, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, November 7, 2022.
Aug 08 2022Consolidated response brief of federal parties filed. VIDED (21-86).
Main DocumentMain Document
Aug 31 2022CIRCULATED
Sep 08 2022Motion to file the reply brief on the merits out of time filed by respondent Michelle Cochran.
Main Document
Sep 08 2022Reply of respondent Michelle Cochran filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 12 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Sep 15 2022Record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas has been electronically filed.
Oct 03 2022Motion to file the reply brief on the merits out of time GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Michelle Cochran
Other
Kellam McChesney Conover
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

kconover@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Raymond J. Lucia, Sr., George R. Jarkesy, Jr., and Christopher M. Gibson
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States
John Kerkhoff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd., Suite 610
Arlington, VA 22201

JKerkhoff@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Gary Michael Lawkowski
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
2121 Eisenhower Avenue, Suite 402
Alexandria, VA 22314

GLawkowski@dhillonlaw.com
7039650330
Party name: Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Jared Alan McClain
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jmcclain@ij.org
8563050034
Party name: Institute for Justice
Nicolas Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
515 South Flower Street, 25th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

nicolasmorgan@paulhastings.com
3108490384
Party name: Phillip Goldstein, Mark Cuban, Nelson Obus, and Investor Choice Advocates Network
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
202-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation