No. 21-1228
Title:Ameranth, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Olo, Inc.
Docketed:March 10, 2022
Linked with 21A254
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1211)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2021Application (21A254) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 6, 2022 to March 7, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Application (21A254) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 7, 2022.
Mar 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2022 to May 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2022.
May 05 2022Brief of respondent Olo, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2022Reply of Ameranth, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried
    Counsel of Record
Ganzfried Law
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com
202-486-2004
Party name: Ameranth, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Heidi Lyn Keefe
    Counsel of Record
Cooley, LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

hkeefe@cooley.com
650-843-5000
Party name: Olo, Inc.