No. 21-1218
Title:Tyler Ayres, et al., Petitioners
v.
Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, et al.
Docketed:March 8, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-15697, 20-15704, 20-16081, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 2, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 7, 2022 to May 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2022Waiver of right of respondent Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 9, 2022.
May 09 2022Brief of respondents Panasonic Corporation (f/k/a Matsushita Electronic Industrial Co., Ltd.) Panasonic Corporation of North America MT Picture Display Co., Ltd. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022Reply of petitioners Tyler Ayres, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Granville Crabtree
    Counsel of Record
Crabtree & Auslander
240 Crandon Boulevard
Suite 101
Key Biscayne, FL 33149

jcrabtree@crabtreelaw.com
(305) 361-3770
Party name: Tyler Ayres, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-5600
Party name: Panasonic Corporation (f/k/a Matsushita Electronic Industrial Co., Ltd.) Panasonic Corporation of North America MT Picture Display Co., Ltd.
Mario N. AliotoTrump, Alioto, Trump & Prescott, LLP
2001 Union Street, #482
San Francisco, CA 94123

malioto@tatp.com
415-563-7200
Party name: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs