No. 21-1217
Title:Columbia House of Brokers Realty, Inc., dba House of Brokers, Inc., dba Jackie Bulgin & Associates, et al., Petitioners
v.
Designworks Homes, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 8, 2022
Linked with 21A264
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3608, 20-1099, 20-3104, 20-3107)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:October 5, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2021Application (21A264) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 3, 2022 to March 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Application (21A264) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 4, 2022.
Mar 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Columbia House of Brokers Realty, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Move, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 07 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Realtors et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Council of Multiple Listing Services, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 07 2022Waiver of right of respondent Designworks Homes, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Copyright Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 19 2022Response Requested. (Due May 19, 2022)
May 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 19, 2022 to June 6, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 6, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Columbia House of Brokers Realty, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Benedict Grimm
    Counsel of Record
Digital Justice Foundation, Inc.
15287 Pepperwood Drive
Omaha, NE 68154

andrew@digitaljusticefoundation.org
5312102381
Party name: Designworks Homes, Inc., et al.
Other
Michael Soonuk Kwun
    Counsel of Record
Kwun Bhansali Lazarus LLP
555 Montgomery St
Suite 750
San Francisco, CA 94111

mkwun@kblfirm.com
415-630-2350
Party name: Copyright Scholars
Brett A. Shumate
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

bshumate@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: National Association of Realtors et al.
Mitchell Abrams Skinner
    Counsel of Record
Larson Skinner PLLC
2701 University Avenue SE, Suite 201
Minneapolis, MN 55414

mskinner@larsonskinner.com
6124246775
Party name: Council of Multiple Listing Services, Inc.
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Move, Inc.