No. 21-1211
Title:Constance George, Petitioner
v.
House of Hope Recovery, et al.
Docketed:March 4, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35551)
   Decision Date:November 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 5, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2022 to May 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 4, 2022.
Apr 04 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law School Clinics.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief of respondents Bridges to Change, Inc. and Washington County Department of Housing Services in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2022Brief of respondents House of Hope Recovery and Patricia Barcroft in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2022Reply of Constance George submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lincoln Davis Wilson
    Counsel of Record
Dechert, LLP
Three Bryant Park, 1095 Sixth Avenue
New York, NY 10036

lincoln.wilson@dechert.com
(212) 698-3500
Party name: Constance George
Attorneys for Respondents
Edwin A. Harnden
    Counsel of Record
Barran Liebman LLP
601 SW 2nd Avenue, Suite 2300
Portland, OR 97204

eharnden@barran.com
503-276-2101
Party name: Bridges to Change, Inc. and Washington County Department of Housing Services
Shanna Ariel Lehrman
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
701 Fifth Avenue Suite 5100
Seattle, WA 98104-7036

slehrman@wsgr.com
206-883-2500
Party name: House of Hope Recovery and Patricia Barcroft
Gregory Lewis WattsWilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5100
Seattle, WA 98104

gwatts@wsgr.com
206-883-2617
Party name: House of Hope Recovery and Patricia Barcroft
Other
James Stephen Azadian
    Counsel of Record
Dykema Gossett LLP
333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2100
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jazadian@dykema.com
213-457-1800
Party name: Law School Clinics