No. 21-1210
Title:Scott County, Tennessee, Petitioner
v.
Tammy Brawner
Docketed:March 4, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5623)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2022Waiver of right of respondent Tammy M. Brawner to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Macomb, Oakland, and Wayne Counties, Michigan filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of National Troopers Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of Kentucky Jailers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 12 2022Response Requested. (Due May 12, 2022)
Apr 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 12, 2022 to June 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 13, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Caitlin Carlisle Burchette
    Counsel of Record
Taylor & Knight, GP
800 S. Gay Street, Suite 600
Knoxville, TN 37929

cburchette@taylorknightlaw.com
(865) 971-1701
Party name: Scott County, Tennessee
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Everett Collins II
    Counsel of Record
Stanley, Kurtz & Collins, PLLC
422 S. Gay Street, Suite 301
Knoxville, TN 37902

richard@knoxvilleattorney.com
(865) 522-9942
Party name: Tammy M. Brawner
Other
Jeffrey C. Mando
    Counsel of Record
Adams Law, PLLC
40 West Pike Street
P.O. Box 861
Covington, KY 41011

jmando@adamsattorneys.com
8593946200
Party name: Kentucky Jailers Association
Davidde Alessandro Stella
    Counsel of Record
Macomb County Corporation Counsel
One S. Main Street, 8th Floor
Mount Clemens, MI 48043

dstella@waynecounty.com
(586) 469-6346
Party name: Macomb, Oakland, and Wayne Counties, Michigan
Daniel Baringer StilzKinkead & Stilz, PLLC
301 East Main Street, Suite 800
Lexington, KY 40507

bstilz@ksattorneys.com
8592962300
Party name: Kentucky Jailers Association
Amanda Marie Zdarsky
    Counsel of Record
McGraw Morris P.C .
300 Ottawa Avenue NW, Suite 820
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

azdarsky@mcgrawmorris.com
6162883700
Party name: National Troopers Coalition, et al