No. 21-12
Title:Federal Election Commission, Appellant
v.
Ted Cruz for Senate, et al.
Docketed:July 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Columbia
   Case Numbers:(19-cv-908 (NJR) (APM) (TJK))
   Decision Date:June 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2021Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due August 6, 2021)
Jurisdictional StatementCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 06 2021Brief amicus curiae of Campaign Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2021Motion to affirm or dismiss filed by appellees Ted Cruz For Senate, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 25 2021Opposition to motion to affirm or dismiss filed by appellant Federal Election Commission.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2021Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits.
Nov 05 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Ted Cruz For Senate, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Brief of appellant Federal Election Commission filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, January 19, 2022.
Nov 17 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. D.C. Circuit.
Nov 17 2021The record from the U.S.D.C. District of Columbia is electronic and located on Pacer.
Nov 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2021CIRCULATED
Dec 15 2021Brief of appellees Ted Cruz For Senate, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Senator Mitch McConnell filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of United States Senators Roy Blunt, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Protect the First Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Republican National Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2022Reply of appellant Federal Election Commission filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 19 2022Argued. For appellant: Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For appellees: Charles J. Cooper, Washington, D. C.
May 16 2022Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Alito, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Kagan, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Sotomayor, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellant
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Election Commission
Attorneys for Appellees
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Ted Cruz For Senate, et al.
Other
Donald A. Daugherty Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

ddaugherty@ifs.org
4145596902
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
LEHOTSKY KELLER LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott@lehotskykeller.com
5126938350
Party name: UNITED STATES SENATORS ROY BLUNT, BILL CASSIDY, KEVIN CRAMER, CINDY HYDE-SMITH, AND ROGER WICKER
Donald Francis McGahn II
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

DMcGahn@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Senator Mitch McConnell
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Claire Naila Rajan
    Counsel of Record
Allen & Overy LLP
1101 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

claire.rajan@allenovery.com
20242098658
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the First Foundation
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Campaign Legal Center, et al.,
Michael Eugene Toner
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

mtoner@wiley.law
2027197545
Party name: Republican National Committee
Barnaby W. Zall
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Barnaby Zall
685 Spring St. #314
Friday Harbor, WA 98250

bzall@aol.com
360-378-6600
Party name: Public Policy Legal Institute