No. 21-1197
Title:KK-PB Financial, LLC, Petitioner
v.
160 Royal Palm, LLC
Docketed:March 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12361, 20-12368)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 25, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2022 to May 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
May 02 2022Brief of respondent 160 Royal Palm, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022Reply of petitioner KK-PB Financial, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jaime Augusto Bianchi
    Counsel of Record
White and Case LLP
200 S. Biscayne Blvd.
Suite 4900
Miami, FL 33131

jbianchi@whitecase.com
305-995-5259
Party name: KK-PB Financial, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
George Eric Brunstad Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
199 Lawrence Street
New Haven, CT 06511

Eric.Brunstad@dechert.com
8605243960
Party name: 160 Royal Palm, LLC