No. 21-1194
Title:Virginia Duncan, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Docketed:March 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-55376)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Virginia Duncan, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2022 to May 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2022.
Mar 30 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association for Gun Rights, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Twenty-Three States filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2022Brief of respondent Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California, in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 11 2022Reply of petitioners Virginia Duncan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Virginia Duncan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Avenue
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3917
Party name: Rob Bonta
Other
Thomas B. Bruns
    Counsel of Record
Bruns, Connell, Vollmar & Armstrong, LLC
4750 Ashwood Drive, Ste. 200
Cincinnati, OH 45241

tbruns@bcvalaw.com
(513) 326-0274
Party name: National Association for Gun Rights, Inc.
Michael Shawn Catlett
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

michael.catlett@azag.gov
(602)542-5025
Party name: Twenty-Three States
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
FPC Action Foundation
5550 Painted Mirage Rd
Suite 320
Las Vegas, NV 89149

jgreenlee@fpcaf.org
(916) 517-1665
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition
Craig Allen Livingston
    Counsel of Record
Linvingston Law Firm, P.C.
1600 South Main Street
Suite 280
Walnut Creek, CA 94596

clivingston@livingstonlawyers.com
(925) 952-9880
Party name: The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
Jeremiah Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

jmorgan@lawandfreedom.com
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Heller Foundation, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Montana Shooting Sports Association, Oregon Firearms Federation, Tennessee Firearms Association, California Constitutional Rights Foundation, America’s Future, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee