No. 21-1193
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Robert Eric Wadkins
Docketed:March 2, 2022
Linked with 21A355
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2018-790)
   Decision Date:October 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 20 2022Application (21A355) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 26, 2022 to February 25, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 24 2022Application (21A355) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until February 25, 2022.
Feb 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Apr 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2022 to May 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2022.
Apr 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2022 to May 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2022.
May 10 2022Brief of respondent Robert E. Wadkins in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Robert E. Wadkins.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Leonard Ritchie Powell
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LeonardPowell@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Robert E. Wadkins