No. 21-1191
Title:Gabriel Gonzalez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 28, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2824)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2022 to April 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2022.
Apr 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2022 to May 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 16, 2022.
May 16 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE
Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Gabriel Gonzalez
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States