No. 21-119 | |
Title: | Postmates, LLC, fka Postmates, Inc., Petitioner v. Jacob Rimler, et al. |
Docketed: | July 28, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District |
Case Numbers: | (A156450) |
Decision Date: | December 9, 2020 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | February 24, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 26 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 17 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 15 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021. |
Sep 20 2021 | Response Requested. (Due October 20, 2021) |
Sep 23 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 20, 2021 to December 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 24 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 1, 2021. |
Nov 17 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 1, 2021 to January 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 18 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 31, 2022. |
Jan 19 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 31, 2022 to March 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 31, 2022. |
Mar 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2022 to April 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 22 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 29, 2022. |
Apr 25 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2021 to May 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 26 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 31, 2022. |
May 23 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2022 to July 22, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 24 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 22, 2022. |
Jul 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 22, 2022 to September 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 30, 2022. |
Sep 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2022 to October 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 23 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 31, 2022. |
Oct 13 2022 | Joint motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 17 2022 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Theane Evangelis Kapur Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP 333 South Grand Ave. 48th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90071 tevangelis@gibsondunn.com | 213.229.7726 |
Party name: Postmates, LLC (F/K/A Postmastes, Inc.) | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Shannon Liss-Riordan Counsel of Record | Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C. 729 Boylston Street Suite 2000 Boston, MA 02116 sliss@llrlaw.com | 6179945800 |
Party name: Jacob Rimler, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Eric F. Citron Counsel of Record | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. 7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850 Bethesda, MD 20814 ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com | (202) 362-0636 |
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. |