No. 21-118
Title:Apple Inc., Petitioner
v.
Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, et al.
Docketed:July 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1043, 2021-1044, 2021-1046)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 26, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 27, 2021 to September 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 27, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Computer and Communications Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Leading Innovators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of ACT | The App Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Roku, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 27, 2021 to October 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 27, 2021, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Mary Agnes Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

catherine.carroll@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6072
Party name: Apple Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
H. Annita ZhongIrell & Manella LLP
1800 Avenue of the Star, #900
Los Angeles, CA 90067

hzhong@irell.com
310-203-7183
Party name: Optis Cellular Technology, LLC, et al.
Other
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Leading Innovators
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Joshua Stephen Landau
    Counsel of Record
Computer and Communications Industry Association
25 Massachusetts Ave
Suite 300C
Washington, DC 20001

jlandau@ccianet.org
202-470-3622
Party name: Computer and Communications Industry Association
Brian Eugene Scarpelli
    Counsel of Record
ACT The App Association
1401 K Street NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20005

bscarpelli@actonline.org
5175071446
Party name: ACT | The App Association
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Roku, Inc.