No. 21-1179
Title:Eric Lund, Petitioner
v.
Jeffrey Datzman, et al.
Docketed:February 25, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-17133)
   Decision Date:October 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 3, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 23 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2022Waiver of right of respondent Susannah Lund to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 08 2022Letter pursuant to Rule 12.6 of respondent Susannah Lund filed.
Main Document
Mar 24 2022Waiver of right of respondents City of Vacaville, Jeffrey Datzman, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2022Waiver of right of respondents County of Solano, Solano County District Attorney's Office, Krishna Abrams and Ilana Shapiro to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 18 2022Response Requested. (Due May 18, 2022)
Apr 18 2022Letter from counsel for petitioner dated April 18, 2022 received.
Main Document
May 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2022 to May 26, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 26, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Hashim M. Mooppan
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

hmmooppan@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Eric Lund
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jellis@mcguirewoods.com
202-828-2887
Party name: County of Solano, Solano County District Attorney's Office, Krishna Abrams and Ilana Shapiro
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jellis@mcguirewoods.com
202-828-2887
Party name: City of Vacaville, Jeffrey Datzman, et al.
Joshua A. Klein
    Counsel of Record
California Dept Justice - Office Solicitor General
1515 Clay Street
Suite 2000
Oakland, CA 94612-1413

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
510-879-0756
Party name: California, et al.
Christopher D. BeattyCalifornia Office of the Attorney General
1515 Clay Street
Oakland, CA 94612

christopher.beatty@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California, et al.
Danielle Kono LewisSelman Breitman LLP
33 New Montgomery, 6th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

dlewis@selmanlaw.com
415-979-2073
Party name: County of Solano, Solano County District Attorney's Office, Krishna Abrams and Ilana Shapiro
Susannah LundLaw Office of Susannah M. Lund
702 Mangrove Ave., #320
Chico, CA 95926

susannah@malifence.com
530-864-2869
Party name: Susannah Lund
Richard W. OsmanBertrand, Fox, Elliott, Osman and Wenzel
2749 Hyde Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

rosman@bfesf.com
415-353-0999
Party name: City of Vacaville, Jeffrey Datzman, et al.