No. 21-1170
Title:Louis Ciminelli, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 24, 2022
Linked with 21A298
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3710, 18-3712, 18-3715, 18-3850)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2022Application (21A298) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 1, 2022.
Feb 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2022 to April 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2022.
Mar 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2022 to May 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2022.
May 24 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2022Reply of petitioner Louis Ciminelli filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 12, 2022.
Aug 29 2022Brief of petitioner Louis Ciminelli filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Brief of respondent Alain Kaloyeros in support of petitioner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Brief of respondents Steven Aiello and Joseph Gerardi in support of petitioner filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Amicus brief of New York Council of Defense Lawyers not accepted for filing.(Corrected version submitted) (September 13, 2022)
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed.(Sep. 13, 2022)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Associated General Contractors of America, Inc filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Louis Ciminelli
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Campion Miller
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mmiller@steptoe.com
+1 (212) 506-3900
Party name: Alain Kaloyeros in support of petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Alexandra Anastasia Ekaterina Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Shapiro Arato Bach LLP
500 Fifth Avenue
40th Floor
New York, NY 10110

ashapiro@shapiroarato.com
(212) 257-4880
Party name: Steven Aiello and Joseph Gerardi in support of petitioner
Other
Adrian L. Bastianelli III
    Counsel of Record
Peckar & Abramson, P.C.
1325 Avenue of the Americas, 10th Floor
New York, NY 10019

abastianelli@pecklaw.com
(212) 382-0909
Party name: Associated General Contractors of America, Inc
Joshua Lewis Dratel
    Counsel of Record
Dratel & Lewis
29 Broadway
Suite 1412
New York, NY 10006

jdratel@joshuadratel.com
2127320707
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Michael Dallas Lieberman
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

michael.lieberman@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Law Professors
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America