No. 21-1169
Title:Alain Kaloyeros, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 24, 2022
Linked with 21A298
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3710, 18-3712, 18-3715, 18-3850)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2022Application (21A298) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2022 to March 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomaryor.
Jan 07 2022Application (21A298) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 1, 2022.
Feb 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2022 to April 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2022.
Mar 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2022 to May 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Campion Miller
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1114 Avenue of the Americas, 35th Floor
New York, NY 10036

mmiller@steptoe.com
+1 (212) 506-3955
Party name: Alain Kaloyeros
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers