No. 21-1168
Title:Robert Mallory, Petitioner
v.
Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Docketed:February 23, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District
   Case Numbers:(3 EAP 2021)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2022Brief of respondent Norfolk Southern Railway Co. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2022Reply of petitioner Robert Mallory filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022Petition GRANTED.
Apr 28 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Blanket Consent
Apr 28 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Robert Mallory
Blanket Consent
May 05 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 5, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 26, 2022.
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October, 11, 2022.
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania Eastern District.
Jul 01 2022Record received from the First Judicial District of Pennsylvania Trial Division - Civil Office of judicial records. 1 - Box.
Jul 05 2022Brief and separate Statutory Appendix of petitioner Robert Mallory filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Pennsylvania Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Academy of Rail Labor Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2022Brief amici curiae of U.S. Terror Victims in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2022Amicus brief of Public Citizen not accepted for filing. (July 15, 2022 - Corrected PDF to be submitted.)
Jul 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2022Brief amici curiae of The Center for Auto Safety and The Attorneys Information Exchange Group filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Scholars on Corporate Registration and Jurisdiction in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure Professors in support of neither party filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Stephen E. Sachs in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of United Policyholders, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2022CIRCULATED
Aug 03 2022ARGUMENT RESCHEDULED for Tuesday, November 8, 2022.
Aug 26 2022Brief of respondent Norfolk Southern Railway Co. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Pennsylvania Coalition for Civil Justice Reform and the Pennsylvania Manufactures’ Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2022Brief amici curiae of DRI Center for Law and Public Policy and the International Association of Defense Counsel filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers and Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Tanya Monestier filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States; American Tort Reform Association; Coalition for Litigation Justice; American Trucking Associations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Lea Brilmayer filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Virginia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 12 2022Record requested from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania Eastern District.
Sep 23 2022Reply of petitioner Robert Mallory filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Nov 08 2022Argued. For petitioner: Ashley C. Keller, Chicago, Ill. For respondent: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D. C.; and Curtis E. Gannon, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ashley Conrad Keller
    Counsel of Record
Keller Postman LLC
150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100
Chicago, IL 60606

ack@kellerpostman.com
3127415222
Party name: Robert Mallory
Attorneys for Respondent
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
James M. Beck
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
Three Logan Square, Suite 3100
1717 Arch Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103-2713

jmbeck@reedsmith.com
215-851-8100
Party name: Pennsylvania Coalition for Civil Justice Reform and the Pennsylvania Manufactures’ Association
Zach Chaffee-McClure
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
2555 Grand Blvd
Kansas City, MO 64108

zmcclure@shb.com
816-559-2404
Party name: DRI Center for Law and Public Policy and the International Association of Defense Counsel
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: U.S. Terror Victims
Larry E. Coben
    Counsel of Record
Anapol Weiss
8700 E. Vista Bonita Drive
Suite 268
Scottsdale, AZ 85255

lcoben@anapolweiss.com
480-515-4745
Party name: The Center for Auto Safety and The Attorneys Information Exchange Group
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Association of American Railroads
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-349-1421
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Scott Andrew Eisman
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Derringer LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
31st Floor
New York, NY 10022

scott.eisman@freshfields.com
2122774000
Party name: Professor Lea Brilmayer
Andrew Nathan Ferguson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

AFerguson@oag.state.va.us
8047867704
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-7838400
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers and Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc
Christopher Edward Kozak
    Counsel of Record
Plews Shadley Racher & Braun LLP
1346 N. Delaware Street
Indianapolis, IN 46202

ckozak@psrb.com
3176370700
Party name: United Policyholders, Inc.
Ruxandra Maniu Laidacker
    Counsel of Record
Kline & Specter, P.C.
1525 Locust St., 19th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102

andra.laidacker@klinespecter.com
215-772-1452
Party name: Pennsylvania Association for Justice
Lawrence Moses Mann
    Counsel of Record
Alper & Mann, PC
9205 Redwood Avenue
Bethesda, MD 20817

mann.larrym@gmail.com
202-298-9191
Party name: Academy of Rail Labor Attorneys
Lawrence Moses Mann
    Counsel of Record
Alper & Mann, PC
9205 Redwood Avenue
Bethesda, MD 20817

mann.larrym@gmail.com
202-298-9191
Party name: Academy of Rail Labor Attorenys
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: Professor Tanya Monestier
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Civil Procedure Professors
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Andrew Stuart Pollis
    Counsel of Record
Case Western Reserve University School of Law
10900 Euclid Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44106

andrew.pollis@case.edu
2163682766
Party name: Cassandra Burke Robertson, et al.
Peter Bowman Rutledge
    Counsel of Record
215 Morton Avenue
Athens, GA 30605

borutledge70@gmail.com
706 542 7140
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States; American Tort Reform Association; Coalition for Litigation Justice; American Trucking Associations
Stephen Edward Sachs
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
1545 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

ssachs@law.harvard.edu
617-495-5009
Party name: Stephen E. Sachs
Jeffrey Robert White
    Counsel of Record
American Association for Justice
777 6th Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20001-3723

jeffrey.white@justice.org
2029442839
Party name: American Association for Justice