No. 21-1164
Title:Larry Steven Wilkins, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:February 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35745)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 23, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2022 to April 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2022.
Apr 25 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 05 2022Reply of petitioners Larry Steven Wilkins, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jun 23 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioners' brief on the merits and the joint appendix is extended to and including August 4, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 20, 2022.
Jul 06 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Larry Steven Wilkins, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 04 2022Brief of petitioners Larry Steven Wilkins, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 11 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 11 2022Brief amici curiae of Local Government Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2022Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al. GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

jmccoy@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Larry Steven Wilkins, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Daniel H. Bromberg
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

dan.bromberg@pillsburylaw.com
(415) 477-4716
Party name: Local Government Organizations
Elizabeth Gaudio Milito
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center
555 12th Street, NW
Ste. 1001
Washington, DC 20004

elizabeth.milito@nfib.org
(202) 406-4443
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Cato Institute, Goldwater Institute, and Texas Public Policy Foundation