No. 21-1161
Title:Steven Aiello and Joseph Gerardi, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 23, 2022
Linked with 21A298
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2990, 18-3710, 19-1272)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2021
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:November 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2022Application (21A298) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 1, 2022.
Feb 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2022 to April 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2022.
Mar 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Criminal Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2022 to May 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alexandra Anastasia Ekaterina Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Shapiro Arato Bach LLP
500 Fifth Avenue
40th Floor
New York, NY 10110

ashapiro@shapiroarato.com
(212) 257-4880
Party name: Steven Aiello and Joseph Gerardi
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Michael Dallas Lieberman
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

michael.lieberman@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Criminal Law Scholars
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers