No. 21-1160
Title:Alfred Morin, Petitioner
v.
William Lyver, et al.
Docketed:February 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1280)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition and FPC Action Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 12 2022Response Requested. (Due May 12, 2022)
May 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 12, 2022 to July 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 11, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David D. Jensen
    Counsel of Record
David Jensen PLLC
33 Henry Street
Beacon, NY 12508

david@djensenpllc.com
212-380-6615
Party name: Alfred Morin
Attorneys for Respondents
Julia Eleanor Kobick
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

julia.kobick@mass.gov
617-963-2559
Party name: Massachusetts
Janelle M. AustinKP Law PC
101 Arch Street, 12th Floor
Boston, MA 02210-1109

jaustin@k-plaw.com
617-556-0007
Party name: William Lyver
Other
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
FPC Action Foundation
5550 Painted Mirage Rd
Suite 320
Las Vegas, NV 89149

jgreenlee@fpclaw.org
(916) 517-1665
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition and FPC Action Foundation