No. 21-1158
Vide 21-1161, 21-1169, 21-1170
Title:Joseph Percoco, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2990, 18-3710, 19-1272)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2022Application (21A298) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2022 to March 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jan 07 2022Application (21A298) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 1, 2022.
Feb 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2022 to April 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2022.
Mar 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2022 to May 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Joseph Percoco
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers