No. 21-1145
Title:Molina Healthcare of Illinois, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Thomas Prose
Docketed:February 17, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2243)
   Decision Date:November 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2022 to April 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 20, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of America’s Health Insurance Plans filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2022 to April 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 27, 2022.
Apr 27 2022Brief of respondent Thomas Prose in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022Reply of petitioners Molina Healthcare of Illinois, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Anne Margaret Voigts
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
50 California Street
Suite 3300
San Francisco, CA 94111

avoigts@kslaw.com
(415) 318-1200
Party name: Molina Healthcare of Illinois, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Sparacino PLLC
1920 L Street, NW
Suite 835
Washington, DC 20036

tejinder@sparacinopllc.com
2026293530
Party name: Thomas Prose
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
202.588.0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111-4004

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: America’s Health Insurance Plans