No. 21-1134
Title:Bryan Adams, Petitioner
v.
Department of Homeland Security
Docketed:February 16, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1649)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 29, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2022 to April 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 18, 2022.
Mar 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2022 to May 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 17, 2022.
May 17 2022Brief of respondent Department of Homeland Security in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Bryan Adams
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security
Other
Daniel Stephen Volchok
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

daniel.volchok@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Members of Congress