No. 21-1124
Title:National Postal Policy Council, et al., Petitioners
v.
Postal Regulatory Commission, et al.
Docketed:February 16, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1276, 20-1505, 20-1510, 20-1521)
   Decision Date:November 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2022 to April 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 18, 2022.
Mar 18 2022Brief of respondent Association for Postal Commerce in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2022 to May 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 18, 2022.
May 18 2022Brief of respondents Postal Regulatory Commission, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ayesha N. Khan
    Counsel of Record
Potomac Law Group, PLLC
1300 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20004

akhan@potomaclaw.com
2028367136
Party name: National Postal Policy Council, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Postal Regulatory Commission, et al.
Ian David Volner
    Counsel of Record
Venable LL P
600 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

IDVolner@venable.com
202-344-4814
Party name: Association for Postal Commerce