No. 21-1123 | |
Title: | William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, Region 2, Petitioner v. Clinton Nurseries, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | February 14, 2022 |
Linked with 21A207 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-1209) |
Decision Date: | May 24, 2021 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 17, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 03 2021 | Application (21A207) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 16, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 07 2021 | Application (21A207) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 14, 2022. |
Jan 04 2022 | Application (21A207) to extend further the time from January 14, 2022 to February 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Proof of ServiceWritten Request | |
Jan 07 2022 | Application (21A207) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 14, 2022. |
Feb 14 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2022) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Mar 29 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022. |
Apr 04 2022 | Response Requested. (Due May 4, 2022) |
Apr 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2022 to June 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 22 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2022. |
May 09 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2022 to July 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 11 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 1, 2022, for all respondents. |
Jun 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 17 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 1, 2022, for all respondents. |
Jul 26 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2022 to September 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 29 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 1, 2022, for all respondents. |
Aug 30 2022 | Memorandum For Respondents filed. |
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service | |
Sep 14 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022. |
Oct 11 2022 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Siegel v. Fitzgerald, 596 U. S. ___ (2022). |
Nov 14 2022 | Judgment issued. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, Region 2 | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Bradley Loy Drell Counsel of Record | Gold, Weems, Bruser, Sues & Rundell, APLC P.O. Box 6118 Alexandria, LA 71307 bdrell@goldweems.com | 318-445-6471 |
Party name: Clinton Nurseries, Inc., et al. | ||
Eric A. Henzy | Zeisler & Zeisler, PC 10 Middle Street 15th Floor Bridgeport, CT 06604 ehenzy@zeislaw.com | 203-368-4234 |
Party name: Clinton Nurseries, Inc., et al. |