No. 21-1121
Title:Handy Technologies, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Patrick Pote
Docketed:February 14, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B302770)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 10, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Waiver of right of respondent Patrick Pote to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Mar 18 2022Response Requested. (Due April 18, 2022)
Apr 15 2022Brief of respondent Patrick Pote filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angles, CA 90067-3119

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: Handy Technologies, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Andre Michel Mura
    Counsel of Record
Gibbs Law Group LLP
505 14th Street
Suite 1110
Oakland, CA 94612

amm@classlawgroup.com
(510) 350-9700
Party name: Patrick Pote
Amanda KarlGibbs Law Group LLP
505 14th Street, Suite 1110
Oakland, CA 94612

amk@classlawgroup.com
510-350-9243
Party name: Patrick Pote