No. 21-111
Title:NC Financial Solutions of Utah, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Virginia, ex rel. Mark R. Herring, Attorney General
Docketed:July 27, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(190840)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021Waiver of right of respondent Commonwealth of Virginia ex rel. Mark R. Herring, Attorney General to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor George A. Bermann filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2021Response Requested. (Due September 29, 2021)
Aug 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 29, 2021 to October 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 29, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: NC Financial Solutions of Utah, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Michelle Shane Kallen
    Counsel of Record
Virginia Office of the Attorney General
202 North 9th Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mkallen@oag.state.va.us
8047867240
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia ex rel. Mark R. Herring, Attorney General
Other
Elliot Friedman
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
601 Lexington Ave
New York, NY 10022

elliot.friedman@freshfields.com
2122304666
Party name: Professor George A. Bermann