No. 21-109
Title:California State Lands Commission, Petitioner
v.
Eugene Davis, Liquidating Trustee of the Venoco Liquidating Trust, et al.
Docketed:July 27, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1061, 20-1062, 20-1063)
   Decision Date:May 24, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Letter from counsel for respondent California received.
Main Document
Aug 18 2021Brief of respondent Eugene Davis, in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Venoco Liquidating Trust in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2021Reply of petitioner California State Lands Commission filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven S. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Loeb & Loeb LLP
10100 Santa Monica Blvd.
Suite 2200
Los Angeles,, CA 90067

srosenthal@loeb.com
(202) 550-0508
Party name: California State Lands Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
Warren Wayne Harris
    Counsel of Record
Bracewell, LLP
711 Louisiana Straeet
Suite 2300
Houston, TX 77002

warren.harris@bracewell.com
7132211490
Party name: Eugene Davis, in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Venoco Liquidating Trust
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3896
Party name: State of California