No. 21-1089
Vide 21-7083, 21-7095, 21-7119
Title:Jeff Garvin Smith, Cary Dale Vandiver, Patrick Michael McKeoun, David Randy Drozdowski, and Vincent John Witort, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:February 7, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2364, 18-2365. 18-2323, 18-2324, 18-2342, 18-2401, 18-2410)
   Decision Date:September 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 16, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2022 to April 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2022.
Mar 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2022 to May 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 9, 2022.
May 09 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 19 2022Reply of petitioners Jeff Garvin Smith, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Craig A. Daly
    Counsel of Record
Craig A. Daly, P.C.
P.O. Box 720
Royal Oak, MI 48068

4bestdefense@sbcglobal.net
(248) 439-0132
Party name: Jeff Garvin Smith, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States