No. 21-1086
Vide 21-1087
Title:John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al., Appellants
v.
Evan Milligan, et al.
Docketed:February 7, 2022
Linked with 21A375, 21A493
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(2:21-cv-1530)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2022Application (21A375) for a stay or injunctive relief pending appeal, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 28 2022Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due March 9, 2022)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixAppendix
Jan 28 2022Response to application (21A375) requested by Justice Thomas, due by noon on Wednesday, February 2, 2022.
Jan 31 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Louisiana, et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by John Wahl, Chairman, Alabama State Republican Executive Committee.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by The National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by United States Representatives from Alabama. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Alabama Center for Law and Liberty. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 02 2022Response to application from respondents Evan Milligan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 02 2022Reply of applicants John Merrill, et al. filed.
ReplyReplyProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Application (21A375) referred to the Court.
Feb 07 2022Application (21A375) granted by the Court. The application is treated as a jurisdictional statement (No. 21-1086), and probable jurisdiction is noted. The district court's January 24, 2022 preliminary injunction in No. 2:21-cv-1530 is stayed pending further order of the Court. Justice Kavanaugh, with whom Justice Alito joins, concurring in grant of applications for stay. (Detached opinion). The Chief Justice dissenting from grant of applications for stay. (Detached opinion). Justice Kagan, with whom Justice Breyer and Justice Sotomayor join, dissenting from grant of applications for stays. (Detached opinion).
Feb 22 2022This case is consolidated with No. 21-1087, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The question presented in these cases is: Whether the District Courts in these cases correctly found a violation of section 2 of the Voting Rights Act, 52 U. S. C. §10301.
Feb 22 2022Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21-1086. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21-1086. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 01 2022Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time file the briefs on the merits. VIDED.
Main Document
Mar 04 2022Motion to modify or amend the question presented filed by appellees and respondents. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 08 2022Joint motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix, appellants', and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including April 25, 2022. The time to file appellees' and respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including July 11, 2022. VIDED.
Mar 08 2022Application (21A493) of appellants/petitioners for leave to file consolidated opening and reply briefs on the merits, submitted to Justice Thomas. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 08 2022Response of appellants and petitioners to the motion to modify or amend the question presented filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 14 2022Application (21A493) granted by Justice Thomas for leave to file consolidated opening and reply briefs on the merits provided that the opening brief does not exceed 18,000 words and the reply brief does not exceed 10,000 words. VIDED.
Mar 21 2022Upon consideration of the motion to modify or amend the question presented, the question presented in these cases is amended as follows: Whether the State of Alabama’s 2021 redistricting plan for its seven seats in the United States House of Representatives violated section 2 of the Voting Rights Act, 52 U. S. C. §10301. VIDED.
Mar 30 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Marcus Caster, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 30 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Evan Milligan, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 31 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 25 2022Joint appendix filed (three volumes). VIDED. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Apr 25 2022Brief of appellants John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2022Brief amici curiae of Senator John Braun, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alabama Center for Law and Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Legislative Exchange Council filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Project on Fair Representation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Republican Redistricting Trust filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of John Wahl, Chairman, Alabama State Republican Executive Committee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Singleton Plaintiffs in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers Democracy Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Republican National Committee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amici curiae of The State of Louisiana, et al filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amici curiae of United States Representatives from Alabama filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Coastal Alabama Partnership filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October, 4, 2022. VIDED.
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Birmingham, Alabama.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Abha KhannaElias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Marcus Caster, et al.
Deuel RossNAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
700 14th Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

dross@naacpldf.org
212-965-7712
Party name: Evan Milligan, et al.
Other
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
701 University Avenue, Suite 106
Sacramento, CA 95825

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Citizens United, et al.
Jonathan Andrew Berry
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates
801 17th St. NW Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

berry@boydengrayassociates.com
2029550620
Party name: Project on Fair Representation
James Uriah Blacksher
    Counsel of Record
825 Linwood Road
Birmingham, AL 35222

jublacksher@gmail.com
2056123752
Party name: Singleton Plaintiffs
Efrem M. Braden
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave. N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

mbraden@bakerlaw.com
(202) 861-1711
Party name: Lawyers Democracy Fund
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Jonathon Paul Hauenschild
    Counsel of Record
American Legislative Exchange Council
2900 Crystal Dr., Ste. 600
Arlington, VA 22202

jhauenschild@alec.org
7033730933
Party name: American Legislative Exchange Council
Albert Linch Jordan
    Counsel of Record
Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC
800 Shades Creek Parkway
Suite 400
Birmingham, AL 35209

bjordan@wallacejordan.com
205-874-0305
Party name: John Wahl, Chairman, Alabama State Republican Executive Committee
Christopher Ernest Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: United States Representatives from Alabama
Christopher Ernest Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: America First Legal
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: The State of Louisiana, et al
John Cowles Neiman Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
1901 Sixth Avenue North
Suite 1700
Birmingham, AL 35203

jneiman@maynardcooper.com
2052541228
Party name: Coastal Alabama Partnership
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Charles Robert Spies
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
1825 Eye Street NW
STE 900
Washington, DC 20006

cspies@dickinsonwright.com
202-466-5964
Party name: Senator John Braun, Leader of the Washington Senate Republican Caucus, et al.
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jtorchinsky@holtzmanvogel.com
540 341 8808
Party name: The National Republican Redistricting Trust
David Alan Warrington
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
2121 Eisenhower Avenue
Suite 402
Alexandria, VA 22314

dwarrington@dhillonlaw.com
7035741206
Party name: Republican National Committee