No. 21-1066
Title:Washington Bankers Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Washington, et al.
Docketed:February 1, 2022
Linked with 21A181
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(98760-2)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2021Application (21A181) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 29, 2021 to January 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 24 2021Application (21A181) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 28, 2022.
Jan 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 3, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Waiver of right of respondent Washington, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 02 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Western Bankers Association.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2022Response Requested. (Due April 4, 2022)
Mar 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of Council on State Taxation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Professionals in Taxation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Bank Policy Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2022 to May 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 4, 2022.
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Washington State Tax Practitioners filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2022Brief of respondents Washington, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Reply of Washington Bankers Association, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Alan Shumsky
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

eshumsky@orrick.com
202-339-8464
Party name: Washington Bankers Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: Washington, et al.
Other
Robert M. Dato
    Counsel of Record
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
500 Capitol Mall, Suite 1900
Sacramento, CA 95814

rdato@buchalter.com
(916) 945-1121
Party name: Western Bankers Association
Karl A. Frieden
    Counsel of Record
Council On State Taxation
122 C Street NW, Suite 330
Washington, DC 20001

kfrieden@cost.org
2024845215
Party name: Council On State Taxation
Dirk Giseburt
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
920 Fifth Avenue
Suite 3300
Seattle, WA 98101

dirkgiseburt@dwt.com
206-757-8049
Party name: Washington State Tax Practitioners
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Bank Policy Institute
Kyle Oliver Sollie
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
Three Logan Square, Suite 3100
1717 Arch Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ksollie@reedsmith.com
2158518852
Party name: Institute for Professionals in Taxation