No. 21-1052
Title:United States, ex rel. Jesse Polansky, M.D., M.P.H., Petitioner
v.
Executive Health Resources, Inc., et al.
Docketed:January 31, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3810)
   Decision Date:October 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2022 to April 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2022.
Feb 18 2022Motion of respondent Executive Health Resources Inc. to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2022 to April 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2022, for all respondents.
Mar 23 2022Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2022 to May 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2022Motion of Executive Health Resources, Inc. to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2022 to May 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 24 2022The motions to extend the time to file a response are granted and the time is further extended to and including May 3, 2022, for all respondents.
May 03 2022Brief of respondent Executive Health Resources, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
May 18 2022Reply of petitioner United States, ex rel. Jesse Polansky, M.D., M.P.H. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jul 28 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States, ex rel. Jesse Polansky, M.D., M.P.H.
Blanket Consent
Jul 28 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 26, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 17, 2022.
Aug 26 2022Brief of petitioner United States, ex rel. Jesse Polansky, M.D., M.P.H. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Brutus Trading, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue, Ste. 700
Dallas, TX 75219

daniel.geyser@haynesboone.com
303-382-6219
Party name: United States, ex rel. Jesse Polansky, M.D., M.P.H.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: Executive Health Resources, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Patrick Michael McSweeney
    Counsel of Record
McSweeney, Cynkar & Kachouroff, PLLC
3358 John Tree Hill Road
Powhatah, VA 23139

patrick@mck-lawyers.com
8049370895
Party name: Brutus Trading, LLC
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Sparacino PLLC
1920 L Street, NW
Suite 835
Washington, DC 20036

tejinder@sparacinopllc.com
(202) 629-3530
Party name: Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund