No. 21-1047
Title:Annick Roy, as Special Administrator of the Estate of Jean-Guy Veilleux, Deceased, et al., Petitioners
v.
Canadian Pacific Railway Company
Docketed:January 27, 2022
Linked with 21A184
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1108)
   Decision Date:June 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 8, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2021Application (21A184) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 7, 2021 to January 24, 2022, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 30 2021Application (21A184) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until January 24, 2022.
Jan 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2022 to March 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 30, 2022.
Feb 28 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Who Teach or Write on Civil Procedure or Federal Courts filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2022 to April 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 20, 2022.
Apr 20 2022Brief of respondent Canadian Pacific Railway Co. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2022Reply of petitioners Annick Roy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Annick Roy, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
1700 New York Ave NW
Washington, DC 20006

wallj@sullcrom.com
(202) 956-7500
Party name: Canadian Pacific Railway Co.
Mark Fletcher RosenbergSullivan & Cromwell, LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

rosenbergm@sullcrom.com
212-558-3647
Party name: Canadian Pacific Railway Co.
Other
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC
2117 Leroy Place, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: Law Professors Who Teach or Write on Civil Procedure or Federal Courts