No. 21-1043
Title:Abitron Austria GmbH, et al., Petitioners
v.
Hetronic International, Inc.
Docketed:January 26, 2022
Linked with 21A153
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6057, 20-6100)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 11 2021Application (21A153) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 22, 2021 to January 21, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Application (21A153) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until December 22, 2021.
Dec 09 2021Application (21A153) to extend further the time from December 22, 2021 to January 21, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Application (21A153) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 21, 2022.
Jan 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2022 to March 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 28, 2022.
Mar 28 2022Brief of respondent Hetronic International, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Rule 29.6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed with respect to Brief in Opposition of Respondent Hetronic International.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 12 2022Reply of petitioners Abitron Austria GmbH, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Sep 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 12 2022Supplemental brief of respondent Hetronic International, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners Abitron Austria GmbH, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 04 2022Petition GRANTED.
Dec 02 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Abitron Austria GmbH, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 09 2022Letter requesting permission to file the joint appendix under the deferred method filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2022The Clerk has approved the deferred method for filing of the joint appendix per Rule 26.4.
Dec 19 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 1, 2023.
Dec 19 2022Brief of petitioners Abitron Austria GmbH, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. for the Tenth Circuit.
Dec 21 2022Record received from the U.S.C.A. Tenth Circuit. Sealed portions of Appendix transmitted electronically. The remaining record is available on PACER.
Dec 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2022Brief amici curiae of German Law Professors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Guido Westkamp filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Dr. Louis Pahlow filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor William S. Dodge in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States supporting neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of International Trademark Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of European Commission on Behalf of the European Union in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amici curiae of Three Intellectual Property Law Professors in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2022Record received from the U.S.D.C. Western District of Oklahoma. Sealed records transmitted electronically. The remaining record is available on PACER.
Jan 06 2023REMOVED from the argument calendar for Wednesday, March 1, 2023.
Jan 11 2023Motion of respondent for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2023Motion of respondent for an extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2023.
Jan 17 2023CIRCULATED
Jan 18 2023The deferred joint appendix is to be filed on or before February 3, 2023.
Jan 27 2023Brief of respondent Hetronic International, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 21, 2023.
Jan 31 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Stussy, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2023Joint Appendix submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
202-556-2010
Party name: Abitron Austria GmbH, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Hetronic International, Inc.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States
William James Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Conrad | Metlitzky | Kane LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
Suite 1400
San Francisco, CA 94111

wcooper@conmetkane.com
4153437100
Party name: Professor Guido Westkamp
Theodore H. Davis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com
4048156534
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

mrd28@georgetown.edu
202-661-6609
Party name: Professor William S. Dodge
Deborah Delores Enix-Ross
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago , IL 60654

AMICUSBRIEFS@AMERICANBAR.ORG
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Paul F. Enzinna
    Counsel of Record
Ellerman Enzinna PLLC
1050 30th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20007

Penzinna@ellermanenzinna.com
202-753-5553
Party name: Professor Dr Louis Pahlow
Michael Robert Franzinger
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K St. NW
Washington, DC 20005

mfranzinger@sidley.com
2027368583
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Timothy R. Holbrook
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
1301 Clifton Rd, NE
Atlanta, GA 30322

tholbrook@emory.edu
404-712-0353
Party name: Three Intellectual Property Law Professors
Lawrence K. Nodine
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr, LLP
999 Peachtree St., Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA 30309

nodinel@ballardspahr.com
(678) 420-9300
Party name: International Trademark Association
Neil Anthony Friedman Popovic
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

npopovic@sheppardmullin.com
415.434.9100
Party name: European Commission on Behalf of the European Union
John Lee Shepherd Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20035

jshepherd@huntonak.com
2029551500
Party name: German Law Professors
John R. Sommer
    Counsel of Record
John R. Sommer, Attorney-at-Law
17853 Santiago Blvd., Suite 107-160
Villa Park, CA 92861

SOMMER@SOMMER.LAW
9497525344
Party name: Stussy, Inc.
Richard S. Stockton
    Counsel of Record
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
71 S. Wacker Dr. Ste. 3600
Chicago, IL 60606

rstockton@bannerwitcoff.com
312-463-5000
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association