No. 21-1028
Title:International Energy Ventures Management, L.L.C., Petitioner
v.
United Energy Group, Ltd.
Docketed:January 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-20221)
   Decision Date:May 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:October 18, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Waiver of right of respondent United Energy Group, Ltd. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 10 2022Response Requested. (Due March 14, 2022)
Feb 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 14, 2022 to April 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2022.
Apr 13 2022Brief of respondent United Energy Group Ltd. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 18 2022Rule 29.6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed with respect to brief in opposition of respondent United Energy Group Ltd..
Main Document
Apr 29 2022Reply of petitioner International Energy Ventures Management, L.L.C. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas C. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Wright Close & Barger, LLP
One Riverway
Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

wright@wrightclosebarger.com
7135724321
Party name: International Energy Ventures Management, L.L.C.
Thomas C. WrightWright, Close & Barger LLP
1 Riverway, Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

melkonian@wrightclose.com
7135724321
Party name: International Energy Ventures Management, L.L.C.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lawrence T. Kass
    Counsel of Record
Culhane Meadows PLLC
13101 Preston Road
Ste. 110-1520
Dallas, TX 75240

lkass@cm.law
(914) 564-5694
Party name: United Energy Group Ltd.
Michael B. BennettCulhane Meadows PLLC
13101 Preston Road, Ste. 110-1520
Dallas, TX 75240

mbennett@cm.law
713-243-3596
Party name: United Energy Group, Ltd.