No. 21-102 | |
Title: | Marcus Walker, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | July 26, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-4062) |
Decision Date: | March 5, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 22 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 25, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 18 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 25, 2021 to September 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 19 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2021. |
Sep 07 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2021 to October 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 22, 2021. |
Oct 22 2021 | Memorandum for the United States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 09 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021. |
Jun 21 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022. |
Jun 27 2022 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of United States v. Taylor, 596 U. S. ___ (2022). |
Jul 29 2022 | JUDGMENT ISSUED |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John Patrick Elwood Counsel of Record | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 601 Massachusetts Ave., NW Washington, DC 20001 john.elwood@arnoldporter.com | (202) 942-5992 |
Party name: Marcus Walker | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |