No. 21-1019
Title:The ERISA Industry Committee, Petitioner
v.
City of Seattle, Washington
Docketed:January 19, 2022
Linked with 21A104
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35472)
   Decision Date:March 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2021Application (21A104) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 30, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Application (21A104) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 14, 2022.
Jan 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The ERISA Industry Committee
Blanket Consent
Jan 28 2022Waiver of right of respondent City of Seattle to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 04 2022Letter from counsel for petitioner submitted.
Main Document
Feb 11 2022Amicus brief of American Hotel and Lodging Association, et al. not accepted for filing. (February 14, 2022) (Corrected efiling to be submitted)
Feb 11 2022Brief amici curiae of American Hotel and Lodging Association, et al. filed.(2/15/2022) (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Feb 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Restaurant Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2022Brief amici curiae of American Benefits Council, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2022Response Requested. (Due March 25, 2022)
Mar 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2022 to April 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2022.
Apr 25 2022Brief of respondent City of Seattle in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 10 2022Reply of petitioner The ERISA Industry Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: The ERISA Industry Committee
Attorneys for Respondent
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris and Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa Street
Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

pstris@stris.com
2139956800
Party name: City of Seattle
Jeremiah MillerSeattle City Attorney's Office
701 5th Avenue, Suite 2050
Seattle, WA 98104

jeremiah.miller@seattle.gov
206-256-5495
Party name: City of Seattle
Other
Richard J. Birmingham
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300
Seattle, WA 98104

richbirmingham@dwt.com
(206) 622-3150
Party name: American Hotel and Lodging Association, et al.
Gabriel Kalman Gillett
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

GGillett@jenner.com
312-840-7220
Party name: Restaurant Law Center, et al.
Mark Christopher Nielsen
    Counsel of Record
Groom Law Group, Chartered
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Suite 1200
Washington, DC 20006

Mcn@groom.com
2028670620
Party name: The American Benefits Council, Business Group On Health, The HR Policy Association, The National Alliance Of Healthcare Purchaser Coalitions, The Alabama Employer Health Consortium, The Healthcare Purchaser Alliance Of Maine, The Silicon Valley Employers Forum And The Society For Human Resource Management
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111

JPagliaro@newenglandlegal.org
617-695-3660
Party name: The New England Legal Foundation
Eugene Scalia
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

escalia@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: The Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al.
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The Business Roundtable, The National Association of Manufacturers