No. 21-1013
Title:Republic of Turkey, Petitioner
v.
Lusik Usoyan, et al.
Docketed:January 18, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-7017, 20-7019)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:October 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 13 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent Lusik Usoyan, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 14 2022Response Requested. (Due March 16, 2022)
Mar 15 2022Brief of respondents Lusik Usoyan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Mar 29 2022Reply of petitioner Republic of Turkey filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Samuel Saltzman
    Counsel of Record
Saltzman & Evinch, PLLC
1310 19th Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

dsaltzman@saltzmanevinch.com
2026379877
Party name: Republic of Turkey
Attorneys for Respondents
Steven R. Perles
    Counsel of Record
Perles Law Firm, PC
816 Connecticut Avenue Northwest
12th Floor
Washington DC, DC 20006

sperles@perleslaw.com
202-306-5932
Party name: Lusik Usoyan, et al.