No. 21-1005 | |
Title: | Heat On-The-Fly, LLC, et al., Petitioners v. Energy Heating, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | January 14, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2020-2038) |
Decision Date: | October 14, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 12 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2022) |
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 28 2022 | Waiver of right of respondents Energy Heating, LLC and Rocky Mountain Oilfield Services, LLC to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 23 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022. |
Mar 21 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Devan Viswanathan Padmanabhan Counsel of Record | Padmanabhan & Dawson, PLLC 45 South Seventh Street, Suite 2315 Minneapolis, MN 55402 devan@paddalawgroup.com | 6124443601 |
Party name: Heat On-The-Fly, LLC, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Frederick Ross Boundy Counsel of Record | Davis Wright Tremaine LLP 920 5th Ave. Suite 3300 Seattle, WA 98104 rossboundy@dwt.com | 206-757-8201 |
Party name: Energy Heating, LLC and Rocky Mountain Oilfield Services, LLC |