No. 21-10
Title:Lori Braun, Petitioner
v.
Brian Burke, Arkansas State Trooper, et al.
Docketed:July 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2961)
   Decision Date:December 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2021Motion of Bill Bryant for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew C. Clarke
    Counsel of Record
The Cochran Firm Midsouth
One Commerce Square, Suite 1700
Memphis, TN 38103

aclarke@cochranfirmmidsouth.com
9015231222
Party name: Lori Braun
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: Bill Bryant