No. 20A66
Title:Democratic National Committee, et al., Applicants
v.
Wisconsin State Legislature, et al.
Docketed:October 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2835)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 14 2020Application (20A66) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Oct 14 2020Response to application (20A66) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due Friday, October 16, 2020, by noon ET.
Oct 16 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Tony Evers, Governor of Wisconsin.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 16 2020Response to application from respondent Wisconsin State Legislature filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Oct 16 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Election Law Scholars.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 16 2020Response of Chrystal Edwards, et al. to application submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Application (20A66) referred to the Court.
Oct 26 2020Application (20A66) denied by the Court. The application to vacate stay presented to JUSTICE KAVANAUGH and by him referred to the Court is denied. CHIEF JUSTICE ROBERTS, concurring in denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE GORSUCH, with whom JUSTICE KAVANAUGH joins, concurring in denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE KAVANAUGH, concurring in denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE KAGAN, with whom JUSTICE BREYER and JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR join, dissenting. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John M. Devaney
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

jdevaney@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6200
Party name: Democratic National Committee, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jay Alan Urban
    Counsel of Record
Urban & Taylor, S. C.
4701 N Port Washington Road
Milwaukee, WI 53212

jurban@wisconsininjury.com
414-906-1700
Party name: Chrystal Edwards, et al.
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 West Monroe Street
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 267-9323
Party name: Wisconsin State Legislature
Other
Diane Mary Welsh
    Counsel of Record
Pines Bach LLP
122 West Washington Ave.
Suite 900
Madison, WI 53703

dwelsh@pinesbach.com
608-251-0101
Party name: Tony Evers, Governor of Wisconsin
Alexandra Margaret Walsh
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh LLP
2001 M Street NW
10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

awalsh@wilkinsonwalsh.com
2028474020
Party name: Election Law Scholars