No. 20A54 | |
Title: | Republican Party of Pennsylvania, Applicant v. Kathy Boockvar, Secretary of Pennsylvania, et al. |
Docketed: | September 28, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District |
Case Numbers: | (133 MM 2020) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 28 2020 | Application (20A54) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Sep 29 2020 | Response to application (20A54) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, October 5, by 3 p.m. |
Oct 02 2020 | Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Tom Ridge, et al. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | |
Oct 05 2020 | Response to application from respondents Kathy Boockvar, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 05 2020 | Response to application from respondent Luzerne County Election Board filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 05 2020 | Response to application from respondents Pennsylvania Democratic Party,et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 05 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | |
Oct 05 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Christian Family Coalition Florida, Inc. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | |
Oct 06 2020 | Reply of applicant Republican Party of Pennsylvania filed. |
ReplyProof of Service | |
Oct 19 2020 | Application (20A54) referred to the Court. |
Oct 19 2020 | Application (20A54) denied by the Court. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, Justice Gorsuch, and Justice Kavanaugh would grant the application. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John Matthew Gore Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20001 jmgore@jonesday.com | 2028793939 |
Party name: Republican Party of Pennsylvania | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Joseph Matthias Cosgrove Counsel of Record | Selingo Guagliardo LLC 345 Market Street Kingston, PA 18704 jmcosgro@msn.com | 570-287-2400 |
Party name: Luzerne County Election Board | ||
Clifford Benjamin Levine Counsel of Record | Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C. 625 Liberty Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15222 clevine@cohenlaw.com | 412-297-4998 |
Party name: Pennsylvania Democratic Party,et al. | ||
John Bartley DeLone Counsel of Record | Attorney General's Office Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section 15th Floor, Strawberry Square Harrisburg, PA 17120 jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov | 717-783-3226 |
Party name: Kathy Boockvar | ||
Other | ||
Richard Douglas Bernstein Counsel of Record | 1875 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20006 rbernsteinlaw@gmail.com | 3017752064 |
Party name: Tom Ridge, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Stuart Gerson, Christine Todd Whitman | ||
Lawrence J. Joseph Counsel of Record | Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph 1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW Suite 700-1A Washington, DC 20036 ljoseph@larryjoseph.com | 2023559452 |
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund | ||
Dennis Grossman Counsel of Record | 6701 Sunset Drive Suite 104 Miami, FL 33143 dagrossmanlaw@aol.com | 5164666690 |
Party name: Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc. |